Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0734)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 (SB0281)
Title
Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0276)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351
Title
Land Use and Vehicle Miles Traveled Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419
Title
Higher Education - Report on Collection Practices for Unpaid Fees and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316
Title
Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles from Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1587
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0338)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 (HB0336)
Title
Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB0111)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0111 (SB0734) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 (SB0281) Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 (SB0276) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB0351 Land Use and Vehicle Miles Traveled Workgroup Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0419 Higher Education - Report on Collection Practices for Unpaid Fees and Services Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0444 Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1316 Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Towing or Removal of Vehicles from Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1587 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1604 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0276 (HB0338) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 (HB0336) Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0392 Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0474 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0734 (HB0111) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0987 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 9:21 AM