Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parole and Probation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0354)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0786)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473
Title
Truth in Sentencing Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0571)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 (SB0491)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 (SB0468)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 /CH0041 (SB0282/CH0040)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057 (SB0865)
Title
Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Appeal on the Record - Violation of a Condition of Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Use of a Firearm in Commission of a Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0040 (HB1053/CH0041)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0054)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403
Title
Courts - Violation of Probation - Appeal on the Record
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0556)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491 (HB0544)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0541)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 (HB0424)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB1057)
Title
Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related Crime
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and Parole Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 (SB0354) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0424 (SB0786) Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0473 Truth in Sentencing Task Force Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0541 (SB0571) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0544 (SB0491) Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 (SB0468) Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1053 /CH0041 (SB0282/CH0040) Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling Delegate Robinson, B. 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Ways and Means
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 (SB0865) Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related Crime Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1063 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Appeal on the Record - Violation of a Condition of Probation Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Use of a Firearm in Commission of a Crime Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Senator Shank 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 /CH0040 (HB1053/CH0041) Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0054) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0403 Courts - Violation of Probation - Appeal on the Record Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0556) Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0491 (HB0544) Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0571 (HB0541) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0786 (HB0424) Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 (HB1057) Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related Crime Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM