Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parole and Probation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090
Title
Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0265)
Title
Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0953)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0608/CH0182)
Title
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0674)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0398/CH0162)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014
Title
Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141 (SB0867/CH0203)
Title
Correctional Services - Revocation of Parole - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 (SB0916)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement System
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 (SB0722)
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
Drunk Driving - Mandatory Participation in Educational Program
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0311)
Title
Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0162 (HB0921)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 /CH0182 (HB0642)
Title
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB0858)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1330)
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 /CH0203 (HB1141)
Title
Correctional Services - Revocation of Parole - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB1209)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement System
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB0388)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related Crime Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 (SB0265) Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 (SB0953) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 (SB0608/CH0182) Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0719 Public Safety - Firearms - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 (SB0674) Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 (SB0398/CH0162) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1014 Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1141 (SB0867/CH0203) Correctional Services - Revocation of Parole - Repeal of Sunset Delegate Swain 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1199 Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 (SB0916) State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement System Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 (SB0722) Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 Drunk Driving - Mandatory Participation in Educational Program Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 (HB0311) Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0162 (HB0921) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 /CH0182 (HB0642) Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 (HB0858) Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1330) Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 /CH0203 (HB1141) Correctional Services - Revocation of Parole - Repeal of Sunset Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0916 (HB1209) State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement System Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0953 (HB0388) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM