Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parole and Probation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 /CH0805 (SB0224/CH0804)
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 (SB0694)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 (SB0583)
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 (SB0879)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Controlled Dangerous Substance Felony
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Task Force to Study the Imposition of Life Without the Possibility of Parole for Persons Found Guilty of Murder in the First Degree
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526 /CH0622 (SB0934)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 /CH0804 (HB0294/CH0805)
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 (HB0893)
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0723)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 (HB1157)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1526/CH0622)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1187
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0294 /CH0805 (SB0224/CH0804) Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0723 (SB0694) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 (SB0583) Juvenile Law - Probation Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 (SB0879) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Controlled Dangerous Substance Felony Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Task Force to Study the Imposition of Life Without the Possibility of Parole for Persons Found Guilty of Murder in the First Degree Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2017 - 9:30 AM
HB1526 /CH0622 (SB0934) Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0181 Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural Resources Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0224 /CH0804 (HB0294/CH0805) Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 (HB0893) Juvenile Law - Probation Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 (HB0723) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 (HB1157) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1526/CH0622) Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1187 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM