Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Paternity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0411)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0958)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0411) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0411 (HB0958) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM