Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Patuxent Institution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0354)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0276/CH0156)
Title
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 (SB0491)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 /CH0156 (HB0295)
Title
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0054)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491 (HB0544)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 (SB0354) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0295 (SB0276/CH0156) Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide Victims Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0544 (SB0491) Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 /CH0156 (HB0295) Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 12:30 PM
SB0354 (HB0054) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0491 (HB0544) Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer Notifications Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM