Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0238
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0371/CH0028)
Title
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0028 (HB0450)
Title
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0300 /CH0238 Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0450 (SB0371/CH0028) State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas Delegate Carr 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0028 (HB0450) State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM