Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0041)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0348)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0041) Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Delegate Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0348) Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM