Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0291)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0804)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0460/CH0519)
Title
Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0439
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Montgomery County - Vehicle Laws - Prohibited Acts at Intersections MC 10-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0377
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 (HB0108)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0519 (HB0517)
Title
Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 (HB0112)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0108 (SB0291) Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0112 (SB0804) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0273 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0517 (SB0460/CH0519) Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0439 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0614 Montgomery County - Vehicle Laws - Prohibited Acts at Intersections MC 10-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 /CH0377 Transportation - Vision Zero - Establishment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0014 Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0291 (HB0108) Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0519 (HB0517) Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019 Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0804 (HB0112) Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM