Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0668)
Title
Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 (SB0815)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrians - Rights and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526
Title
Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 (HB0876)
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB0973)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0615 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0710 Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0721 (SB0512) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0876 (SB0668) Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 (SB0815) Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Safety Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1263 Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1477 Vehicle Laws - Pedestrians - Rights and Requirements Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1526 Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0065 Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 103
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0512 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0668 (HB0876) Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0815 (HB0973) Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:18 PM