Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Perjury

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0536)
Title
Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 (SB0759)
Title
Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 (SB0696)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221 (SB1029)
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1562
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0833)
Title
Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0951)
Title
Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 (HB1221)
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0833 (SB0536) Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 (SB0759) Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1015 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1071 (SB0696) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 (SB1029) Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1562 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0536 (HB0833) Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0759 (HB0951) Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1029 (HB1221) Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:02 PM