Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Personal Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0693)
Title
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 (SB0872)
Title
Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0382/CH0161)
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0161 (HB0918)
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0434)
Title
Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0898)
Title
Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 (SB0693) Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture Provisions Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 (SB0872) Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - Exemption Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0918 (SB0382/CH0161) Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records Delegate Costa 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1371 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 /CH0161 (HB0918) Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0693 (HB0434) Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0898) Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - Exemption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM