Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Personal Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215
Title
County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 /CH0131
Title
Howard County - Property Tax - Exemption for Personal Property of Business Located in Historic District Ho. Co. 10-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 /CH0141 (SB0204/CH0142)
Title
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 (SB0833)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal Law
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0895)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0841 (SB0858/CH0842)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1561
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Property Used in Well Construction
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0142 (HB0605/CH0141)
Title
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Property Owned by New or Relocated Business
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532
Title
Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0639)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 /CH0842 (HB1415/CH0841)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1180)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0215 County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0268 Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0566 /CH0131 Howard County - Property Tax - Exemption for Personal Property of Business Located in Historic District Ho. Co. 10-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 /CH0141 (SB0204/CH0142) PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 (SB0833) Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0859 Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0888 Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal Law Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 (SB0895) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1238 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1260 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1367 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 /CH0841 (SB0858/CH0842) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers Delegate Anderson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1561 Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Property Used in Well Construction Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0204 /CH0142 (HB0605/CH0141) PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0239 Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Property Owned by New or Relocated Business Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB0639) Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 /CH0842 (HB1415/CH0841) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0895 (HB1180) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM