Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 /CH0645 (SB0170)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representative - Administration of Internet-Based Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 (HB0858/CH0645)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0858 /CH0645 (SB0170) Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0029 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representative - Administration of Internet-Based Accounts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0170 (HB0858/CH0645) Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page