Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0429)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 /CH0443
Title
Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0531)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0531 (SB0429) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Delegate Miele 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0624 /CH0443 Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0429 (HB0531) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM