Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0103
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491 (SB0446)
Title
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0881)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 /CH0545
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Death of a Licensed Dentist - Ownership of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 /CH0354 (SB0793/CH0355)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0935)
Title
Public Health - Delegation of Health Care Decisions - Temporary Health Care Agent for Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0895)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 (HB0491)
Title
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0355 (HB0753/CH0354)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB0722)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1180)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935 (HB0961)
Title
Public Health - Delegation of Health Care Decisions - Temporary Health Care Agent for Minors
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0103 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 (SB0446) State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 (SB0881) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 /CH0545 State Board of Dental Examiners - Death of a Licensed Dentist - Ownership of a Dental Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0753 /CH0354 (SB0793/CH0355) Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0961 (SB0935) Public Health - Delegation of Health Care Decisions - Temporary Health Care Agent for Minors Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 (SB0895) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 (HB0491) State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Senator Kelley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0793 /CH0355 (HB0753/CH0354) Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB0722) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0895 (HB1180) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0935 (HB0961) Public Health - Delegation of Health Care Decisions - Temporary Health Care Agent for Minors Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM