Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0338)
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0233 (SB0466)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 /CH0774
Title
Personnel and Pensions – Phased Retirement Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0024 (SB0677/CH0027)
Title
State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 (SB0944/CH0453)
Title
Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1579 (SB0922)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Nursing Homes - Provision of Beds With Bed Rails
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0335)
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB1579)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0944 /CH0453 (HB1101)
Title
Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0335 (SB0338) State Personnel – Grievance Procedures Delegate Haynes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 /CH0233 (SB0466) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0822 /CH0774 Personnel and Pensions – Phased Retirement Plan Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB1017 /CH0024 (SB0677/CH0027) State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB1101 (SB0944/CH0453) Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB1579 (SB0922) Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Nursing Homes - Provision of Beds With Bed Rails Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 (HB0335) State Personnel – Grievance Procedures Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 (HB1579) Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0944 /CH0453 (HB1101) Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM