Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0441)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 (SB0514)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0820)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB0467)
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Payment of Commissions and Attorney’s Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0318)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 (HB1264)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0565)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808
Title
Health Occupations – Licensed Dentists – Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1261)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 (SB0441) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0565 (SB0514) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0766 Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1261 (SB0820) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1264 (SB0467) Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Payment of Commissions and Attorney’s Fees Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0441 (HB0318) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0467 (HB1264) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0565) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0690 Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0808 Health Occupations – Licensed Dentists – Administration of Vaccines Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1261) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page