Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 (SB0412)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0524 (SB0675/CH0523)
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0433)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0523 (HB0775/CH0524)
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0433 (SB0412) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 /CH0524 (SB0675/CH0523) Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0412 (HB0433) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 /CH0523 (HB0775/CH0524) Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM