Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 (SB0270)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0132
Title
Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0746
Title
Baltimore City - Home Inspectors - Residential Rental Inspections
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0275)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0275 (SB0270) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0496 Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1174 Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1353 /CH0132 Agriculture - Nuisance Insects Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 /CH0746 Baltimore City - Home Inspectors - Residential Rental Inspections Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 746
Finance
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0275) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM