Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 (SB0300)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0821)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 (HB0229)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1369)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0229 (SB0300) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1369 (SB0821) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 (HB0229) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0821 (HB1369) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:04 PM