Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 /CH0614
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Care Provider-Carrier Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0793 (SB0952/CH0363)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875 (SB0825)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB0875)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 /CH0363 (HB0793)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0779 /CH0614 Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Care Provider-Carrier Workgroup Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0793 (SB0952/CH0363) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing Delegate Kach 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0875 (SB0825) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB0875) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0952 /CH0363 (HB0793) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM