Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0113
Title
Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 /CH0581
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB1055)
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162
Title
Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Opioid Antagonists - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1055 (HB1103)
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0154 /CH0113 Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 /CH0581 Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - Prohibition Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB1055) Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Opioid Antagonists - Authorization Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1055 (HB1103) Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM