Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB1023)
Title
Health – Drug Cost Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB1074)
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0451 (SB1079)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376 (SB1077)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1546
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Requirements for Prior Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1639
Title
Maryland Rx Program - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacies and Pharmacists
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1074 (HB1290)
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1077 (HB1376)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 (HB1349/CH0451)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1205
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority to Adopt Regulations - Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1194 (SB1023) Health – Drug Cost Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 (SB1074) Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1349 /CH0451 (SB1079) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1376 (SB1077) Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1546 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Requirements for Prior Authorization Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1639 Maryland Rx Program - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacies and Pharmacists Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB1074 (HB1290) Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1077 (HB1376) Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1079 (HB1349/CH0451) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions Senator Mathias 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1205 Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority to Adopt Regulations - Pharmacy Benefits Managers Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM