Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Duties and Obligations
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 (SB0871)
Title
Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0399 (SB0915/CH0398)
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 /CH0434
Title
State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 /CH0452
Title
Health Insurance – Audits of Pharmacies or Pharmacists – Authorization to Withdraw and Resubmit Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 /CH0455 (SB1017)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Credentialing and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB0943)
Title
Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0915 /CH0398 (HB0978/CH0399)
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017 (HB1307/CH0455)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0134 Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0885 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Duties and Obligations Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 (SB0871) Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0399 (SB0915/CH0398) Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1150 /CH0434 State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 /CH0452 Health Insurance – Audits of Pharmacies or Pharmacists – Authorization to Withdraw and Resubmit Claims Delegate Johnson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 /CH0455 (SB1017) Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Credentialing and Reimbursement Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0871 (HB0943) Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0915 /CH0398 (HB0978/CH0399) Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1017 (HB1307/CH0455) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:50 PM