Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 /CH0583
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064
Title
Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit Images
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 (SB0699/CH0192)
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Criminal Procedure - Animal Abuser Registration
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or Video
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0192 (HB0289)
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 /CH0583 Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit Images Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0289 (SB0699/CH0192) Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0336 Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties Charles County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 Criminal Procedure - Animal Abuser Registration Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or Video Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 /CH0192 (HB0289) Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM