Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0486
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Retention of Estate Files
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 /CH0267
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0930)
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of Property
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0229
Title
Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems - Continuous Audits
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB0947)
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0486 Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Retention of Estate Files Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0494 /CH0267 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016) Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 (SB0930) Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0035 Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0115 Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of Property Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0229 Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems - Continuous Audits Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0901 Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 (HB0947) Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM