Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0970)
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0523)
Title
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0615)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB0784)
Title
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0849)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970 (HB0767)
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0767 (SB0970) Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0784 (SB0523) Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 (SB0615) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0523 (HB0784) Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0849) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0970 (HB0767) Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM