Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0551)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1754 (SB1196)
Title
Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Parking Placards - Color Photograph
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244
Title
Campaign Material – Social Media – Consent for Use of Image
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0749)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1196 (HB1754)
Title
Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0749 (SB0551) Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0768 Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1754 (SB1196) Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0014 Motor Vehicle Administration - Parking Placards - Color Photograph Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0244 Campaign Material – Social Media – Consent for Use of Image Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0749) Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1196 (HB1754) Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page