Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 (SB0034)
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0385)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202
Title
Labor and Employment - Use of Facial Recognition Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Public Safety – Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1578 (SB0476)
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0752)
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0004)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB1578)
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Image Repository System - Access
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857
Title
Facial Recognition Services - Moratorium
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Store Cameras
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0198 Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0307 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 (SB0034) Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0875 Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0923 (SB0385) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1202 Labor and Employment - Use of Facial Recognition Services - Prohibition Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Public Safety – Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1578 (SB0476) Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
SB0034 (HB0752) Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/29/2020 - 2:45 PM
SB0208 (HB0004) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0476 (HB1578) Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0836 Public Safety - Maryland Image Repository System - Access Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0857 Facial Recognition Services - Moratorium Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0945 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Store Cameras Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:00 PM