Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0717)
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 /CH0183
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0422)
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 (SB0717) Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 /CH0183 Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 (HB0422) Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page