Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0116 (SB0647)
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418 (SB0898)
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0178
Title
State Board of Physicians - Distribution of Fees by Comptroller - Loan Assistance Repayment for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647 (HB0752/CH0116)
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0752 /CH0116 (SB0647) Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0911 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 (SB0898) Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0178 State Board of Physicians - Distribution of Fees by Comptroller - Loan Assistance Repayment for Physicians and Physician Assistants Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0647 (HB0752/CH0116) Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM