Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 /CH0419
Title
State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0600/CH0452)
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0452 (HB0761)
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029
Title
Rural Public Institutions of Higher Education - Nurse Practitioner and Physician Assistant Students - Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0638 /CH0419 State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 (SB0600/CH0452) Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services Delegate Patterson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0600 /CH0452 (HB0761) Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1029 Rural Public Institutions of Higher Education - Nurse Practitioner and Physician Assistant Students - Recruitment Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM