Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0826)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252 (SB0102)
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102 (HB1252)
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB0538)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0538 (SB0826) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0774 Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1252 (SB0102) Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0102 (HB1252) Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0826 (HB0538) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page