Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Physical Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0598 (SB0381)
Title
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 (HB1433)
Title
Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 (HB0401/CH0598)
Title
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 /CH0598 (SB0381) Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0052 (HB1433) Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 (HB0401/CH0598) Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM