Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Physical Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412
Title
Purse Dedication Account - Maryland Horse Industry Fund - Retired Racehorses
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0692/CH0575)
Title
Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692 /CH0575 (HB0551)
Title
Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0412 Purse Dedication Account - Maryland Horse Industry Fund - Retired Racehorses Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0551 (SB0692/CH0575) Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0751 State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0692 /CH0575 (HB0551) Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:21 PM