Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Piers and Docks -see also- Marinas; Ports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 (SB0139)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0135
Title
Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
State Wetlands License - Temporary Installation of a Boat Canopy - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 (HB0208)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Historic St. Mary's City Commission - Dove Pier
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0208 (SB0139) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0135 Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 State Wetlands License - Temporary Installation of a Boat Canopy - Exemption Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 (HB0208) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0172 Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Historic St. Mary's City Commission - Dove Pier Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM