Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436 (SB0559/CH0664)
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0421)
Title
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0504)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 (SB0672)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0384/CH0081)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032 (SB0901)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Nicholas Catholic Church Parish Hall
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1646 (SB1078)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 /CH0081 (HB0832)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0583)
Title
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0732)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 /CH0664 (HB0436)
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0816)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901 (HB1032)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Nicholas Catholic Church Parish Hall
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Accokeek First Church of God Center of Excellence
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1078 (HB1646)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion Centers
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0323 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0436 (SB0559/CH0664) Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0583 (SB0421) Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
HB0732 (SB0504) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0816 (SB0672) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0832 (SB0384/CH0081) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1032 (SB0901) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Nicholas Catholic Church Parish Hall Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1646 (SB1078) Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion Centers Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0384 /CH0081 (HB0832) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0421 (HB0583) Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 (HB0732) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0559 /CH0664 (HB0436) Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0672 (HB0816) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0901 (HB1032) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Nicholas Catholic Church Parish Hall Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB1049 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Accokeek First Church of God Center of Excellence Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB1078 (HB1646) Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion Centers Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM