Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0123
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0052 (SB0003/CH0053)
Title
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Douglas Memorial Community Church Village Apartments
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 (SB0514)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Calvary Breath of Life Community Center
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit – Church or Religious Organization Property
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 /CH0197
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 /CH0090
Title
Workgroup on the Licensing of Food Service Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0756)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Maryland Intergenerational Family Life Center
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1745 (SB0689)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - St. Philip Neri Community Hall
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1750
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Orchard Street Church
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1778
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Fort Washington Baptist Church
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1823 (SB1247)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Thomas Methodist Church Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0053 (HB0321/CH0052)
Title
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0707)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Calvary Breath of Life Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 /CH0198
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB1745)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - St. Philip Neri Community Hall
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756 (HB1195)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Maryland Intergenerational Family Life Center
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1247 (HB1823)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Thomas Methodist Church Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 /CH0123 Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 /CH0052 (SB0003/CH0053) Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0590 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Douglas Memorial Community Church Village Apartments Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0707 (SB0514) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Calvary Breath of Life Community Center Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB0758 Public Safety – Handgun Permit – Church or Religious Organization Property Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 /CH0197 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 /CH0090 Workgroup on the Licensing of Food Service Facilities Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 (SB0756) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Maryland Intergenerational Family Life Center Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
HB1745 (SB0689) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - St. Philip Neri Community Hall Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1750 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Orchard Street Church Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB1778 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Fort Washington Baptist Church Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1823 (SB1247) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Thomas Methodist Church Restoration Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0003 /CH0053 (HB0321/CH0052) Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0156 Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0514 (HB0707) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Calvary Breath of Life Community Center Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 /CH0198 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0689 (HB1745) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - St. Philip Neri Community Hall Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0756 (HB1195) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Maryland Intergenerational Family Life Center Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB1247 (HB1823) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Thomas Methodist Church Restoration Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM