Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Distance Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit – Church Property (Worshipper Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 (SB0377)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Place of Worship Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1502
Title
Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB1318)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Place of Worship Restrictions
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917
Title
Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0039 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0119 Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0306 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Distance Restrictions Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Public Safety – Handgun Permit – Church Property (Worshipper Protection Act of 2020) Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 (SB0377) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Place of Worship Restrictions Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1502 Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1604 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0377 (HB1318) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Place of Worship Restrictions Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 9:39 AM