Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 (SB0391)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252
Title
State Development Plan - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409 /CH0521 (SB0443)
Title
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0887/CH0572)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247
Title
State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and Commission
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0240)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB1269)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0106)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0409/CH0521)
Title
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycles
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0520
Title
Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 /CH0572 (HB1187)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970
Title
Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0106 (SB0391) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 State Development Plan - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 /CH0521 (SB0443) Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1187 (SB0887/CH0572) Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1247 State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and Commission Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0240) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 (HB1269) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 (HB0106) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0409/CH0521) Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycles Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 /CH0520 Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0887 /CH0572 (HB1187) Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0970 Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - Compensation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM