Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
State Development Plan - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0601
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 State Development Plan - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0510 /CH0601 Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1217 Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM