Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383)
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 (SB0366)
Title
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0913)
Title
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 /CH0225
Title
Employees' Pension System - Redeposit of Contributions
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383) Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 (SB0366) Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Delegate Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0913) Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 /CH0225 Employees' Pension System - Redeposit of Contributions Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM