Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0355 (SB0494/CH0356)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact – Department of Planning – Name Correction
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0294
Title
County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB0610)
Title
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
State Acquisition of the Fort Howard VA Campus Property
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 /CH0789
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1603 (SB1109)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 /CH0356 (HB0533/CH0355)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 (HB1603)
Title
Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0533 /CH0355 (SB0494/CH0356) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact – Department of Planning – Name Correction Delegate Carr 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 /CH0294 County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 (SB0610) Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0952 State Acquisition of the Fort Howard VA Campus Property Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 /CH0789 Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 789
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1603 (SB1109) Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0494 /CH0356 (HB0533/CH0355) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1109 (HB1603) Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM