Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0656)
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0421)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512
Title
Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0735)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0531)
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0531 (SB0656) Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0713 Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0735 (SB0421) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1512 Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 (HB0735) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0656 (HB0531) Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0918 Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:56 PM