Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Plastics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Environment – Recycling – Prohibition on the Chemical Conversion of Plastic
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 (SB0195)
Title
Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 (SB0223)
Title
Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195 (HB0022)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB0314)
Title
Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 Environment – Recycling – Prohibition on the Chemical Conversion of Plastic Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0022 (SB0195) Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2021 - 3:45 PM
HB0036 Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0069 Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0099 Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0314 (SB0223) Plastic Bag Reduction Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0195 (HB0022) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0223 (HB0314) Plastic Bag Reduction Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 11:03 AM
Click to return on the top page