Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pleas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Explanation of Unit Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Victims' Representatives - Plea Agreements (The Victim Empowerment in Plea Deals Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Repair of Dangerous Defects and Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458
Title
Maryland State Commission for Criminal Sentencing Policy – Sentencing Guidelines – Plea Agreements (Truth in Plea Deals Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0780)
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 370
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Explanation of Unit Rule Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Criminal Procedure - Victims and Victims' Representatives - Plea Agreements (The Victim Empowerment in Plea Deals Act of 2020) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1372 Real Property - Residential Leases - Repair of Dangerous Defects and Failure to Pay Rent Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 Maryland State Commission for Criminal Sentencing Policy – Sentencing Guidelines – Plea Agreements (Truth in Plea Deals Act of 2020) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0780) State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:29 PM