Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 (SB0350/CH0237)
Title
Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal Piping
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0237 (HB0270)
Title
Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0270 (SB0350/CH0237) Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal Piping Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0237 (HB0270) Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM