Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0211)
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0401/CH0029)
Title
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable Wires
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Wheeled Devices and Metal Piping
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Grounds for Disciplinary Action - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 116-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0169)
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0029 (HB0341)
Title
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable Wires
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 (SB0211) State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0341 (SB0401/CH0029) Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable Wires Delegate Davis 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Wheeled Devices and Metal Piping Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 State Board of Plumbing - Grounds for Disciplinary Action - Exception Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0910 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 116-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0211 (HB0169) State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0401 /CH0029 (HB0341) Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable Wires Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM