Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711 (SB0643)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471 (SB0831)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0711)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1471)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0711 (SB0643) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Delegate Frick 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 (SB0831) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0711) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB1471) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and Enforcement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM